Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/06/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/18/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 05/15/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/29/2012