Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/08/2011