Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/08/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/24/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/09/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/18/2012