Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/28/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-219.
12/28/2012 Signed by President.
12/21/2012 Presented to President.
12/19/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2012 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8230)
07/23/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 501).(text: CR H5112)
11/18/2011 Introduced in House