Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/18/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/18/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/29/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/29/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/02/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/06/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/06/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/06/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/06/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/30/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/26/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/11/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/11/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/11/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/11/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/11/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 09/13/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/14/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/19/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/19/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/19/2012