Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/08/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/10/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 08/01/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 08/01/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 08/01/2012