Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/18/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/06/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2012