Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/19/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/11/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/17/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/24/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2012