Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 05/16/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/17/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/17/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/30/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/30/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/30/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/30/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/02/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/20/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/29/2012