Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/08/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/08/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/27/2012