Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 11/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/22/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/23/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/17/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/17/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/10/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/08/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/11/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/05/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/11/2012