Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9]* 11/29/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/29/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/30/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/05/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/05/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/07/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/12/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/23/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/23/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/23/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/23/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/31/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/08/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/08/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/09/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/13/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/14/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/17/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/17/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/06/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/12/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/21/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/26/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/23/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/23/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/13/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/12/2012