Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/10/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/01/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/01/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/01/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/13/2012