Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/02/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/02/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/07/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 12/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/17/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/25/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/31/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew