Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 11/30/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/27/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/27/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/18/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/18/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/18/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/08/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/14/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/16/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/16/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/27/2012