Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/30/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/08/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/20/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/18/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/13/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/13/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/16/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/27/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/05/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/29/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/29/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/29/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/17/2012