Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/18/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/29/2012