Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/02/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/06/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/06/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/06/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/06/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/06/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/06/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/27/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/07/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/11/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/11/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/20/2012