Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 11/30/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/13/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/23/2012