Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/14/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/23/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/23/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/23/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/08/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/17/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/27/2012