There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Railway Labor Act to direct the National Mediation Board to apply the same procedures, including voting standards, to the direct decertification of a labor organization as is applied to elections to certify a representative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/01/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/02/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/01/2011Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/01/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (161)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/07/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/20/2011
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 12/01/2011 12/08/2011 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/01/2011 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials12/02/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3538.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3538. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/01/2011)

Amends the Railway Labor Act to require the National Mediation Board to apply the same procedures, including voting standards, to the direct decertification of a labor organization as are applied to elections to certify a representative.