Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/06/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/31/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/31/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/03/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/03/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/08/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/29/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/29/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 05/16/2012