Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 12/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/14/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/05/2012