Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/02/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/12/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/06/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/25/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/31/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/2012