Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/02/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 12/02/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 12/02/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/05/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/06/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/23/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/25/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/31/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/06/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/06/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/06/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 02/06/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/06/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/09/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/09/2012