Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 12/07/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/17/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/17/2012