Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/03/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/03/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/23/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/16/2012