Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/06/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/17/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/06/2012