Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/31/2012