Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 12/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/23/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/24/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/01/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/01/2012