Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/06/2012