Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/27/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/31/2012