Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/20/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/23/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/23/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/13/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/13/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/16/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew