Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/06/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/06/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/07/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/21/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/30/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/30/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/17/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/08/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/16/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/16/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/07/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 06/21/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/21/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/05/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/16/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/16/2012