Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/10/2012