Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/12/2012