There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Online Freedom Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent United States businesses from cooperating with repressive governments in transforming the Internet into a tool of censorship and surveillance, to fulfill the responsibility of the United States Government to promote freedom of expression on the Internet, to restore public confidence in the integrity of United States businesses, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/08/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
03/27/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/27/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/12/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/14/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2249-2250)
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
12/08/2011Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2011Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2011Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/08/2011 Referred to
03/27/2012 Markup by
House Ways and Means12/08/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade12/13/2011 Referred to
House Financial Services12/08/2011 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises01/12/2012 Referred to
The Helsinki Commission10/19/2012 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3605.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3605. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/08/2011)

Global Online Freedom Act of 2011 - Makes it U.S. policy to: (1) promote the freedom to seek, receive, and impart information and ideas through any media; (2) use all appropriate instruments of U.S. influence to support the free flow of information without interference or discrimination; and (3) deter U.S. businesses from cooperating with Internet-restricting countries in effecting online censorship.

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the President should seek international agreements to protect Internet freedom; and (2) some U.S. businesses, in assisting foreign governments to restrict online access to U.S.-supported websites and government reports and to identify individual Internet users, are working contrary to U.S. foreign policy interests.

Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to require assessments of electronic information freedom in each foreign country.

Directs the Secretary of State to annually designate Internet-restricting countries.

Amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to require each Internet communications services company that operates in an Internet-restricting country to include in its annual report information relating to: (1) human rights due diligence, (2) policies pertaining to the collection of personally identifiable information, and (3) restrictions on Internet search engines or content hosting services.

Amends the Export Administration Act of 1979, as continued in effect under the International Emergency Economic Powers Act, to direct the Secretary of Commerce to: (1) establish a list of goods and technology that would assist a foreign government in acquiring the capability to carry out censorship, surveillance, or any other related activity through means of telecommunications, including the Internet; and (2) prohibit the export of listed goods or technology to a government end user in any Internet-restricting country.