Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 12/15/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/20/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/06/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/07/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/08/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/14/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/14/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/28/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/28/2012