Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/23/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/13/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/17/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/31/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/26/2012