There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Taxpayers Right-To-Know Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Taxpayers Right to Know Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide taxpayers with an annual report disclosing the cost of, performance by, and areas for improvements for Government programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/01/2012Committee on House Administration discharged.
07/31/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-635, Part I.
12/08/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/01/2012Committee on House Administration discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/01/2012Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/2012Referred sequentially to the House Committee on House Administration for a period ending not later than Oct. 1, 2012 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(k), rule X.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-635, Part I.
04/26/2012Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/26/2012Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/08/2011Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform12/08/2011 Referred to
04/26/2012 Markup by
07/31/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-635
House Administration07/31/2012 Referred to
10/01/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (07/31/2012)

Taxpayers Right-To-Know Act - Requires the head of each federal agency, on an annual basis, to: (1) identify and describe every program administered by such agency; (2) determine the total administrative expenses and expenditures for services for each program; (3) estimate the number of clients served by each program and the beneficiaries who received assistance under each program; (4) estimate the number of full-time federal and contract employees who administer each program; and (5) identify federal programs with duplicative or overlapping missions, services, and allowable uses of funds.

Requires each agency head to publish on the agency website, not later than February 1 of each fiscal year, the information required by this Act, the latest performance reviews of each agency program, improper payment rates, the total amount of undisbursed grant funding remaining in grant accounts, and recommendations for consolidating duplicative or overlapping programs, eliminating waste and inefficiency, and terminating lower priority, outdated, and unnecessary programs and initiatives.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), not later than February 1 of each fiscal year, to publish on the OMB website a report that contains: (1) an identification of programs across agencies with duplicative or overlapping missions, services, and allowable uses of funds; and (2) recommendations to consolidate duplicative programs, eliminate waste and inefficiency, and terminate lower priority, outdated, and unnecessary programs and initiatives.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed to require the disclosure of classified information.