Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/18/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/18/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/25/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/31/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew