Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/17/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/08/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/08/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/16/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/30/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/04/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/05/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/09/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/10/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/10/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/10/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/10/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 01/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 01/24/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/19/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew