Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 12/08/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 12/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/27/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/07/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/24/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/24/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/18/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/30/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/10/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/13/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/27/2012