Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/30/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2012