Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/15/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/13/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/31/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/31/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/31/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/01/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/06/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/08/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/05/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/05/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/08/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/09/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/30/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/30/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/30/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/06/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/26/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/28/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/12/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/23/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/26/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/01/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/19/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/03/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2012