Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/17/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/15/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/11/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/13/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/13/2012