Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 12/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/07/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/06/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/06/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/06/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/15/2012