There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 401 Old Dixie Highway in Jupiter, Florida, as the "Roy Schallern Rood Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/05/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 2 (Roll no. 95).(text: CR H1140)
12/12/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
03/14/2012SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
03/06/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/05/2012-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2012-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 2 (Roll no. 95). (text: CR H1140)
03/05/2012-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1143)
03/05/2012-5:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/05/2012-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3637.
03/05/2012-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1139-1140)
03/05/2012-5:00pmHouseMr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/07/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
02/07/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/12/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
12/12/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform12/12/2011 Referred to
02/07/2012 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/06/2012 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security03/14/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3637.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3637. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/12/2011)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 401 Old Dixie Highway in Jupiter, Florida, as the "Roy Schallern Rood Post Office Building."