Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 12/14/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 12/14/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/21/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/21/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/21/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/18/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/21/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/26/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/17/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/17/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/17/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/17/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/17/2012