There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for an additional temporary extension of programs under the Small Business Act and the Small Business Investment Act of 1958, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/31/2011Became Public Law No: 112-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2011Signed by President.
01/28/2011Presented to President.
01/26/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S261)
01/25/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H445)
01/20/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/31/2011Became Public Law No: 112-1. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2011Signed by President.
01/28/2011HousePresented to President.
01/26/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/26/2011SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S261)
01/25/2011SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
01/25/2011-12:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/25/2011-12:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H445)
01/25/2011-12:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 366.
01/25/2011-12:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H445-446)
01/25/2011-12:35pmHouseMr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/20/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
01/20/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business01/20/2011 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.366. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-1 (01/31/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends through May 31, 2011, under the same terms and conditions, the authorization for any program, authority, or provision, including any pilot program, that is currently authorized through January 31, 2011, under the Small Business Act or the Small Business Investment Act of 1958.